+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1338.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1192.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB464 Hurtado
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor