+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2793.)
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 944.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 662.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17.
On December 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 4, 2013: Unfinished Business SB46 Corbett Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
September 3, 2013: SB 46 Corbett Senate Third Reading By GARCIA
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 18, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB46 Corbett
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor