+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2654.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2629.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB456 Padilla
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
January 14, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor