+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 4912.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 4671.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 6192.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 13).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 866.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hernandez.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 866.)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 719.) (April 29).
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 507.) (April 10).
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB455 Hernandez Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
August 20, 2014: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2014: SB 455 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 8
July 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB455 Hernandez
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
May 9, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB455 Hernandez Reconsider
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor