+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3182.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 25 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16).
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2019: Unfinished Business SB453 Hurtado et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 9, 2019: SB 453 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Nazarian
- Yeas: 79
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
July 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB453
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 22, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor