+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1192.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 936.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 588.) (March 23).
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O., JUD., and HUMAN S.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 28, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB452 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor