+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2474.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2017: Special Consent SB449
- Yeas: 40
August 31, 2017: SB 449 Monning Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
July 6, 2017: SB 449 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 28, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 27, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SB449
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9