+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 3248.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 3195.)
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Nazarian.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 32. Page 3043.)
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 1).
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1158.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1014.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 759.) (April 30).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 565.) (April 16).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Business SB448 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2013: SB 448 Leno Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 11
July 1, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB448 Leno
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 16, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor