+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 633, Statutes of 2021.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2384.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2691.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 23).
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 15.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
September 3, 2021: Unfinished Business SB44 Allen et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
September 2, 2021: SB 44 Allen Senate Third Reading By Carrillo
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB44 Allen et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor