+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2019.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- July 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1208.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1).
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 713.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 4, 2019: Unfinished Business SB438 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
September 3, 2019: SB 438 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Eggman
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
May 22, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB438 Hertzberg et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1