+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 751.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 733.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and B., P. & E.D.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Price
Type:
Primary Sponsor