+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 641, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3016.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB428 Hurtado et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 9, 2021: SB 428 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Gray
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB428
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor