+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1043.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 751.) (May 1).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2013: SB 425 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER
- Yeas: 78
August 14, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 3, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB425 DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor