+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5471.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5376.)
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 24.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5238.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5905.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1153.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 8 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 29, 2016: Unfinished Business SB425 Hernandez Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2016: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 11
August 18, 2016: SB 425 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By CHAU
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 11
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB425 Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor