+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1044.) (May 6).
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5