+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 940.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor