+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2759.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB420
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2017: SB 420 Monning Senate Third Reading By QUIRK
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
June 28, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 13, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SB420 Monning
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor