+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.)
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11.
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor