+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2464.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2285.)
- Set for hearing August 30.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2261.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2764.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 869.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 445.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2017: Unfinished Business SB418 Hernandez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 3
August 30, 2017: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 5
August 24, 2017: SB 418 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
July 19, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 27, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB418 Hernandez et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor