+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2864.)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2839.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 2 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3405.) Ordered to the Senate.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 19).
On January 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On January 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Robert Rivas.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
February 3, 2022: Unfinished Business SB418 Laird et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
February 2, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 5
January 27, 2022: SB 418 Laird Third Reading Urgency By Robert Rivas
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 7
January 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
July 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB418
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9