+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and J., E.D., & E.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
June 17, 2013: Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2013: Special Consent #5 SB418 Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11