+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 538, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected August 17)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 953.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 522.) (April 8).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2015: Special Consent #9 SB416 Huff
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: SB 416 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2015: SB 416 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SB416 Huff
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor