+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2552.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2909.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9).
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB41 Umberg et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 41 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel
- Yeas: 80
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
July 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
July 1, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 11
May 28, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB41 Umberg Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 9, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor