+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor