+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5913.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2599.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: Unfinished Business SB406 Evans Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 7, 2014: SB 406 Evans Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 17, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
January 23, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB406 Evans
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 6
January 14, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor