+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2021.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2354.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 2606.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30).
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 1129.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 896.) (April 22).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 500.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 15.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 2, 2021: Unfinished Business SB403 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2021: SB 403 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Arambula
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
August 26, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 30, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 16, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
May 20, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB403 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1