+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2920.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2866.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3152.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1400.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 744.) (April 19).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 536.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 7.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H., EQ., and GOV. & F.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 14, 2017: Unfinished Business SB4 Mendoza Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 13, 2017: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 9
September 11, 2017: SB 4 Mendoza Third Reading Urgency By QUIRK-SILVA
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 15
June 1, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Mendoza
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor