+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 671, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2551.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 9. Page 2940.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR suspense file.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on C. & C.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 12).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB4 Gonzalez et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
September 8, 2021: SB 4 Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency By Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 16
July 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Gonzalez et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor