+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5874.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 6588.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 12).
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 18.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 16.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 10.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 28, 2018: Unfinished Business SB399 Portantino et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
August 27, 2018: SB 399 Portantino Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 6
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB399 Portantino
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
January 18, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 16, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
January 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor