+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 657, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2556.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2915.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On June 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 20).
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB389 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 389 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 80
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
July 12, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15