+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 655, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 388.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2848.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1153.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 4, 2015: Unfinished Business SB388 Mitchell Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 3, 2015: SB 388 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By KIM
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB388 Mitchell
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor