+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3094.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business SB387 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2015: SB 387 Jackson Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 80
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
May 22, 2015: Special Consent #2 SB387 Jackson
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor