+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2015: Special Consent #6 SB386 Allen
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 16, 2015: SB 386 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 16, 2015: SB 386 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
May 22, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SB386 Allen
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor