+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 3217.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
- Coauthors revised.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 27).
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 1269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 13, 2017: Unfinished Business SB386 Glazer et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 12
September 12, 2017: SB 386 Glazer Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB386 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2