+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 622.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB377 Monning
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor