+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2889.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2019: Unfinished Business SB377 McGuire Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2019: SB 377 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 14, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
July 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
July 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 12
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB377 McGuire
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor