+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 24).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7