+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2762.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1146.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Published May 11 at 9 p.m.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 944.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB373
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2017: SB 373 Cannella Senate Third Reading By GRAY
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
July 12, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB373 Cannella et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1