+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected April 18.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor