+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3099.) (January 15).
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 15.
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
January 15, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor