+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13).
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1012.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2013: Special Consent #9 SB367 Block
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 26, 2013: SB 367 Block Senate Third Reading By PÉREZ, V.M.
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2013: Special Consent #8 SB367 Block
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor