+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 3025.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 8).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1152.) (May 28).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 523.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2015: SB 365 Pavley Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Pavley
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor