+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2171.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2581.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2017: Unfinished Business SB365 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 17, 2017: SB 365 Dodd Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 6
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1