+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained.
- Stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3181.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8).
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2019: Unfinished Business SB365 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 9, 2019: SB 365 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Mathis
- Yeas: 79
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
June 18, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB365
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
April 29, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 8, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor