+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- January 5 hearing postponed by committee.
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 5.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 6. Page 620.) Reconsideration granted.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 6
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 6
April 14, 2015: [First] hearing set for [04-14-2015]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 11
April 14, 2015: [First] hearing set for [04-14-2015]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor