+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2166.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2794.)
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2701.)
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 6, 2013: Unfinished Business SB360 Padilla Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
September 4, 2013: SB 360 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PÉREZ, J.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
August 21, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
August 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB360 Padilla
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
May 13, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor