+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2022.
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 29. Page 3109.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2624.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered held at the Desk.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2021: SB 357 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 10
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB357 Wiener et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
July 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB357 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1