+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Wood.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 805.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 28, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB356 McGuire
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
May 6, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor