+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (44)
On September 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3420.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3417.)
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On July 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- Published May 26 at 2 p.m.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 884.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 7.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- February 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 28.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB35 Wiener et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
September 14, 2017: SB 35 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor