+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB348 Chang et al.
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
April 22, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor